Norton v. 1863 PAC, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: Mariah Norton
Defendant: John Doe 2, 1863 PAC, LTD., John Doe 1 and ABC Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00173
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 31 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Mariah Norton. (Skinner, Stephen)
July 23, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by 1863 PAC, LTD..(Ward, Joseph)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT 1863 PAC, LTD.S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 07/09/2019. (cwm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 1863 PAC, LTD. Defendant 1863 Pac, LTD's Initial Disclosures. (Ward, Joseph)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mariah Norton Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Skinner, Stephen)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 6/18/2019. (tlg)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 05/30/2019. (cwm)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Scheduling Order Checklist Other Document re #22 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by 1863 PAC, LTD.. (Ward, Joseph)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER: Upon review and consideration, the Defendant's #21 Unopposed Motion to Stay Discovery pending resolution of the Defendant's motion to dismiss is hereby DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on May 28, 2019. (hf)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ward, Joseph)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Discovery by 1863 PAC, LTD.. (Ward, Joseph)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDINGDISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 04/24/2019. (cwm)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 04/01/2019. (cwm)
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Carol P. Smith by 1863 PAC, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Carol)
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by 1863 PAC, LTD. of Substitution of Appearance (Smith, Carol)
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to the Amended Complaint filed by 1863 PAC, LTD.. (Smith, Carol)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to the Amended Complaint filed by Mariah Norton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Skinner, Stephen)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to the Amended Complaint by 1863 PAC, LTD.. (Smith, Carol)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: Pursuant to the Plaintiff's filing of an #11 Amended Complaint on January 28, 2019, Defendant 1863 PAC, LTD.'s #8 Motion to Dismiss the original complaint is summarily DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on February 7, 2019.(hf)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Mariah Norton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skinner, Stephen)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1863 PAC, LTD., ABC Company, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, filed by Mariah Norton.(Skinner, Stephen)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: On January 14, 2019, Defendants filed a #8 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Accordingly, Defendants' #7 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on January 15, 2019.(hf)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Dismiss by 1863 PAC, LTD. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) . (Smith, Carol)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by 1863 PAC, LTD.. (Smith, Carol)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by 1863 PAC, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Carol)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/4/2018. (cwm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1863 PAC, LTD.. (Smith, Carol)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by 1863 PAC, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Carol)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to 1863 PAC, LTD. served on 11/9/2018. (Skinner, Stephen)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1863 PAC, LTD., ABC Company, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, filed by Mariah Norton. Filing Fee $400 paid Receipt # 0424-2689748. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norton v. 1863 PAC, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1863 PAC, LTD.
Represented By: Carol P. Smith
Represented By: Joseph M Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariah Norton
Represented By: Stephen G. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?