Francois v. Rolfe et al

Plaintiff: Roldy Francois
Defendant: John Officer Doe, Mr. F. Entzel, Dr. Humy, Mr. S. Kallis, Mr. Rolfe, Mr. E. Howell, Dr. Trotter, Mr. Rardra, Officer T. Sapp, Ms. M. Tompkins, P.A. Armel, Officer P. Foltz, S.I.S. Lt. J. Squires, Ms. Brown, Officer B. Benson and Officer John Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv00179
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Gina M Groh
1 Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 18 RETURN RECEIPT as to #14 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/21/2018. (tlg)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER VACATING ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/20/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Main Document 17 replaced on 12/20/2018) (tlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/20/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 VACATED based on Order #17 entered on 12/20/2018. ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/19/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg). Modified on 12/20/2018 (tlg).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/17/2018. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy of order and consent mail/email to Financial Deputy and Trustee Clerk. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Roldy Francois. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Roldy Francois. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 COURT-APPROVED FORM #2 Application and Affidavit to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, filed by Roldy Francois. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 COURT-APPROVED FORM re #1 Complaint, filed by Roldy Francois. (Attachments: #1 memorandum, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope).(tlg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order on Motion to Stay. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/10/2018. (tlg)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY BUT GRANTING PLAINTIFF AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO CORRECT THE DEFICIENT PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/6/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay by Roldy Francois. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/5/2018. (tlg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: #1 Court-Approved Form) (tlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Roldy Francois. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roldy Francois. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against P.A. Armel, B. Benson, Ms. Brown, John Doe, F. Entzel, P. Foltz, E. Howell, Dr. Humy, S. Kallis, Mr. Rardra, Mr. Rolfe, T. Sapp, J. Squires, M. Tompkins, Dr. Trotter, filed by Roldy Francois. (Attachments: #1 Claim form any accompanying documents, #2 Grievance forms, #3 Grievance forms, #4 Remedy appeal, #5 Grievance forms, #6 Grievance forms, #7 Grievance forms, #8 Grievance forms, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francois v. Rolfe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Officer Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. F. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Humy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. S. Kallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Rolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. E. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Rardra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer T. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. M. Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A. Armel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer P. Foltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.I.S. Lt. J. Squires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer B. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roldy Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?