Lindsey v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Lindsey
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00184
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Gina M Groh
1 Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/7/2018 per USPS website. (tlg)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/4/2018. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
November 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Anthony Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Notice (Other), #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 11/20/2018. (tlg)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01423. (tlg)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE re: #1 Letter-Form Complaint under the Federal Tort Claims Act; finding that pursuant to the section 1406(a), it is in the interest of justice that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, which is the district in which this matter could have been brought and is the court of proper jurisdiction; directing that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia, Clarksburg Division, P.O. Box 2857, Clarksburg, West Virginia 26302, for additional proceedings; the plaintiff is directed to address any further information concerning this matter to that court, which will assign the case a new case number and take any further action as that court deems necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 11/14/2018. (cc: plaintiff) (taq) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/14/2018.]
November 13, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/14/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/14/2018.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 LETTER-FORM COMPLAINT. (slr) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 11/14/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsey v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony Lindsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?