Bishop et al v. Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited et al

Plaintiff: Susan Bishop and Estate of John F. Couls
Defendant: Fredericktown Yamaha, Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited and Triumph Motorcycles Limited
Case Number: 3:2018cv00186
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 25 First MOTION for Joinder in Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited's Motion to Dismiss Counts XV and XVI by Fredericktown Yamaha. (Cramer, Joseph)
January 11, 2019 Filing 24 Fredericktown Yamaha ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Fredericktown Yamaha.(Cramer, Joseph)
January 11, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Cramer on behalf of Fredericktown Yamaha (Cramer, Joseph)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 01/07/2019. (cwm)
January 4, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Initial Planning Meeting Dates by Susan Bishop. (Nace, Matthew)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/20/2018. (cwm)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/20/2018. (cwm)
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Shadonna E. Hale on behalf of Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited, Triumph Motorcycles Limited (Hale, Shadonna)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for David Ross: $200.00 - receipt number WVNM001434. (cwm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cramer, Joseph)
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION. Original to David R. Ross via CM/ECF. (cwm)
December 18, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited Request for Production and Inspection to Plaintiff. (Cramer, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited.(Cramer, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM of Law by Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss Counts XV and XVI . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cramer, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss Counts XV and XVI by Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited. (Cramer, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited identifying Corporate Parent Triumph Motorcycles Limited for Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited.. (Cramer, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Triumph Motorcycles Limited. (Cramer, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law by Triumph Motorcycles Limited re #7 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (Cramer, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Triumph Motorcycles Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cramer, Joseph)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T. Cramer on behalf of Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited, Triumph Motorcycles Limited (Cramer, Joseph)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fredericktown Yamaha identifying Other Affiliate Riley Family Enterprises, LLC for Fredericktown Yamaha.. (Moses, Mark)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Fredericktown Yamaha Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint on Behalf of Fredericktown Yamaha (Moses, Mark)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Allen Moses on behalf of Fredericktown Yamaha (Moses, Mark)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fredericktown Yamaha, Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited, Triumph Motorcycles Limited, filed by Estate of John F. Couls, Susan Bishop. Filing Fee $400 paid - Receipt #0424-2706147 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop et al v. Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Bishop
Represented By: Matthew Nace
Represented By: Barry J. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of John F. Couls
Represented By: Matthew Nace
Represented By: Barry J. Nace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredericktown Yamaha
Represented By: Mark Allen Moses
Represented By: J. Greg Goodykoontz
Represented By: Joseph T. Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Motorcycles (America) Limited
Represented By: David M. Ross
Represented By: Shadonna E. Hale
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Joseph T. Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Motorcycles Limited
Represented By: David M. Ross
Represented By: Shadonna E. Hale
Represented By: John F. McCuskey
Represented By: Joseph T. Cramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?