Weast v. Entzel

Petitioner: Christopher Robert Weast
Respondent: Warden Entzel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001458 (tlg)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/4/2019. (tlg)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 1/30/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTIONS to #4 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Christopher Robert Weast. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/14/2019. (tlg)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Christopher Weast to Chief Judge. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNC002461 (tlg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Christopher Robert Weast. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, photocopy of envelope; #2 Exhibit 2, notice to inmate population; #3 Envelope).(tlg)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/8/2019. (tlg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Christopher Robert Weast. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 01/08/2019. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden Entzel, filed by Christopher Robert Weast. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weast v. Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Robert Weast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Entzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?