Thacker v. Warden

Petitioner: Ross Thacker
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 3:2019cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: Gina M Groh
1 Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 Order on Motion to Reopen Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/4/2019. (tlg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/28/2019. (tlg)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REOPEN APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/28/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ross Thacker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Reopen Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, by Ross Thacker. (Attachments: #1 petition for habeas corpus, #2 cover letter, #3 Envelope).(tlg)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/19/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/10/2019. (tlg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-01548. (tlg)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #4 Order Transferring Case to Plaintiff. (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: It is ORDERED that this matter be transferred to the USDC/NDWV. Plaintiff is directed to address any further filings concerning this matter to that court. Signed by Senior Judge David A. Faber on 1/7/2019. (cc: Plaintiff) (arb) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 27, 2018 CASE assigned to Judge David A. Faber. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ross Thacker in support of #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28. U.S.C. 2241 (mk) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/7/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Ross Thacker against Warden, FCI McDowell, pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. Filing Fee $5. Receipt # 1BLUE001501. (Attachment: #1 Receipt, #2 Cover Letter) (mk). (Modified on 12/27/2018 to add cover letter) (mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thacker v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ross Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?