Crawford v. USA
Petitioner: Shakeem Heratio Crawford
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00013
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, #6 Clerk's Judgment. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/4/2019. (tlg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of USA against Shakeem Heratio Crawford. Signed by Clerk of Court on 2/26/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; and DENYING and DISMISSING #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Shakeem Heratio Crawford. Judgment is to be entered in favor of the Respondent and this action is stricken from the docket. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/26/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Shakeem Heratio Crawford. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/19/2019. (tlg)
February 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone no longer assigned to case per #3 order. (tlg)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Shakeem Heratio Crawford. It is the recommendation that the motion be DENIED and DISMISSED as an unauthorized second or successive motion. Objections may be filed within 14 days after being served a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 2/11/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 PAPERLESS NOTICE - This case was opened for statistical purposes only and all docketing will be done in criminal case 3:06cr69. (tlg)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Shakeem Heratio Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Paul T. Camilletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shakeem Heratio Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?