Taylor v. Jividen et al
Plaintiff: Donald Lee Taylor
Defendant: Captain Kalifinoski, A.I.G. Casualty Insurance Company, Bob Parker, Patrick Mirandy, Judy Childers, Betsy Jividen and Kristen Tidd
Case Number: 3:2019cv00027
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Change of Address by Donald Lee Taylor. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Address updated per pro se plaintiff's request. (cwm)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT as to #14 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT A.I.G. CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 03/25/2019. (cwm)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT A.I.G. CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 03/21/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/21/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #11 ORDER AND ROSEBORO NOTICE, #10 NOTICE of Magistrate Judge availability to exercise Jurisdiction (AO85) pursuant to LR PL P 28., and #9 ORDER GRANTING 2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 03/15/2019. (cwm)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant A.I.G. by Donald Lee Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/19/2019 with correct pleading and NEF regenerated) (tlg).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND ROSEBORO NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 3/12/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Magistrate Judge availability to exercise Jurisdiction (AO85) pursuant to LR PL P 28. ***ATTORNEYS: DO NOT FILE EXECUTED CONSENT ELECTRONICALLY. Mailed to pro se pls by cm,rrr.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 3/12/2019. Copy to pro se pls by cm,rrr. Copy with #3 Consent to Financial Deputy and Trustee Officer.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 03/05/2019. (cwm)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by A.I.G. Casualty Insurance Company re #6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Parker, Don)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by A.I.G. Casualty Insurance Company. (Parker, Don)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Donald Lee Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, and #2 Envelope)(cwm)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Donald Lee Taylor. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Lee Taylor. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.I.G. Casualty Insurance Company, Judy Childers, Betsy Jividen, Kalifinoski, Patrick Mirandy, and Bob Parker, and Kristen Tidd filed by Donald Lee Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Disciplinary Appeal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Grievance Appeal, #3 Letter, and #4 Envelope). Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. Copy of file stamped letter returned to plaintiff. (cwm) Modified: correct docket text on 3/4/2019 (cwm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Jividen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Kalifinoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.I.G. Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Don C. A. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Mirandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Jividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Tidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?