Sweeris v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James B. Sweeris
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Does 1 to 50
Case Number: 3:2019cv00080
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 Mail sent to James B. Sweeris #4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Return to Sender - Unclaimed - Unable to Forward. (cwm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002624. (cmd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 05/31/2019. (cwm)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 05/21/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James B. Sweeris. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Does 1 to 50, filed by James B. Sweeris. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, and #3 Envelope)(cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeris v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Sweeris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?