Stephens v. Freeman

Plaintiff: Devon Stephens
Defendant: Jeff Freeman, Alex Neville, Doug Yost and Jean Clay
Case Number: 3:2019cv00082
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 7/11/2019. (tlg)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/8/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 5/28/2019 per USPS website. (Because return receipt card was not received back in the clerk's office, receipt was printed from website for proof of service per request of LC Sims.) (tlg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to issue summons by Devon Stephens. (Attachments: #1 proposed summons, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Devon Stephens. (Attachments: #1 affidavit of indigency, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeff Freeman, Doug Yost, Alex Neville, Jean Clay, filed by Devon Stephens. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) Modified on 5/29/2019 to add the additional defendants that were omitted originally (tlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Neville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Yost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?