Holman v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Ellen Michele Holman
Defendant: Seneca Trustees, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Samuel I. White, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00084
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/10/2019. (tlg)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mehalic, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Saunders, Randall)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Saunders, Randall)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Seneca Trustees, Inc..(Campbell, W.)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Samuel I. White, P.C..(Campbell, W.)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 5/28/2019. (tlg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, WV, (case number 19-C-154), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, state court documents; #2 Exhibit B, notice filing notice of removal; #3 Exhibit C, consent to removal; #4 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2826937(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holman v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seneca Trustees, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Kelly
Represented By: W. Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Randall L. Saunders
Represented By: Ashley N. Barebo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel I. White, P.C.
Represented By: Robert Kelly
Represented By: W. Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Michele Holman
Represented By: Jeffrey V. Mehalic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?