Rice v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Joenell L. Rice
Defendant: Correctional Officer Waltzs, Lootinient (sic) Smith and Correctional Officer McDuffy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00087
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to McDuffy served on 7/2/2019. (cwm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Waltzs served on 6/17/2019. (cwm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Smith served on 6/17/2019. (cwm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Joenell L. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Document was darkened to the fullest extent; original in the file if requested.(tlg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 27 Partial Filing fee: $4.20 - receipt number WVNE014204. (cwm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 RETURN RECEIPT as to #24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 07/01/2019 per USPS website. (cwm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 RETURN RECEIPT as to #22 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/27/2019 per USPS website. (tlg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/28/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
June 27, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN RECEIPT as to #20 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/20/2019 per USPS website. (cwm)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO ANSWER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/24/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Joenell L. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Administrative Remedy Appeal, and #2 Envelope) Documents scanned as dark as possible. Originals in file for review if needed. (cwm)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR APPOINTED COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/17/2019. Copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Joenell L. Rice. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 Initial Partial Filing fee: $5.60 - receipt number WVNE014111. (cwm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General served on 6/10/2019 per USPS website. (cwm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order to Answer on U.S. Attorney General. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/10/2019 per USPS website. (cwm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Joenell L. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cmd)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from Joenell Rice to WV Court re: grievance. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Rejection Notice - Admin. Remedy, #2 Envelope)(cmd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 05/31/2019 per USPS website. (cwm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/03/2019. (cwm)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order to Answer. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/03/2019 per USPS website. (cwm)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 ORDER TO ANSWER. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 05/31/2019 per USPO website on William Powell US Attorney for NDWV. (cwm) (Main Document 10 replaced, link to document corrected and NEF regenerated on 6/11/2019) (cwm).
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to William Powell, US Attorney for NDWV served on 5/31/2019. Service date confirmed by USPO website. (cwm)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 05/29/2019. Copy to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy to E. Howell & trustee officer by email/mail with copy of order and consent. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 VACATED per #22 ORDER entered 06/24/2019 - ORDER TO ANSWER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 05/29/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy to USA NDWV and US Attorney General by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joenell L. Rice. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Joenell L. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joenell L. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McDuffy, Smith, Waltzs, filed by Joenell L. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joenell L. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Waltzs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lootinient (sic) Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer McDuffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?