Eckerson et al v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lucas J. Eckerson and Trevor J. Eckerson
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00088
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Continue by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Annand, Stephen)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/9/2019. (tlg)
July 4, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Brill, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(Annand, Stephen)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE : ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 5/30/2019. (tlg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Jonathon C. Stanley. (tlg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (tlg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Hampshire County, WV, (case number CC-14-2019-C-3), filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, state court documents; #2 Exhibit B, notice of filing; #3 Exhibit C, state court docket sheet; #4 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2828177(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eckerson et al v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas J. Eckerson
Represented By: Jonathan G. Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor J. Eckerson
Represented By: Jonathan G. Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathon C. Stanley
Represented By: Stephen D. Annand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?