Field v. State of West Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Dale Preston Field, Jr.
Defendant: County of Marion, Trooper Timothy Morris, Jeffery Freeman, West Virginia State Police, State of West Virginia, West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation and The County Commission of Marion County
Case Number: 3:2019cv00089
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Marion, Jeffery Freeman, Timothy Morris, State of West Virginia, The County Commission of Marion County, West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, West Virginia State Police, filed by Dale Preston Field, Jr.(tlg)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER. For good cause, the Court finds that Petitioner/Plaintiff should be granted leave to file an amended complaint. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the attachment [7-1]to MOTION #7 to Amend/Correct be filed as an Amended Complaint in this action. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to print a copy of this paperless order and to send it, by certified mail, return receipt requested, to the pro se Petitioner's last known address as reflected on the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 7/24/2019. (dh)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Dale Preston Field, Jr. (Attachments: #1 amended complaint, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/3/2019 as per USPS website. (tlg) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/7/2019 with correct file stamp date) (tlg).
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Dale Preston Field, Jr. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Dale Preston Field, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dale Preston Field, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Marion, Jeffery Freeman, Timothy Morris, State of West Virginia, West Virginia State Police, filed by Dale Preston Field, Jr. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Field v. State of West Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Timothy Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The County Commission of Marion County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Preston Field, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?