Taccino v. City of Cumberland Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Michael E. Taccino, Sr.
Defendant: City of Cumberland Maryland, Potomac Highlands Airport Authority, Allegany County Government Maryland and First Energy Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00091
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: Gina M Groh
2 Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/3/2019 per USPS website. (cmd)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 6/3/2019 per USPS website. (cmd)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 5/31/2019. Copy to pro se pls by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Copy to pro se pls by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael E. Taccino, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(cmd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allegany County Government Maryland, City of Cumberland Maryland, First Energy Corp., Potomac Highlands Airport Authority, filed by Michael E. Taccino, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Issuance upon granting of IFP, #3 Envelope)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taccino v. City of Cumberland Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cumberland Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potomac Highlands Airport Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegany County Government Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Energy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Taccino, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?