Justice v. USA
Petitioner: Steven Justice
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00100
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 07/18/2019. (cwm)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/15/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/24/2019. (cwm)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Steven Justice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 06/20/2019. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/20/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Steven Justice. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?