Engle v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Engle
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00101
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/29/2019. (cmd)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Fenwick, Carrie)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Elizabeth Engle. Amended Report of Parties' Planning Meeting. (Milnes, Lydia)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Milnes, Lydia)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #7 Response in Opposition to Motion to extend Defendant's deadline to file Reply to July 24, 2019 by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Fenwick, Carrie)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Counts I & III by Elizabeth Engle. (Milnes, Lydia)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Elizabeth Engle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Milnes, Lydia)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time for Plaintiff to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Elizabeth Engle. (Milnes, Lydia)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM In Support by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Fenwick, Carrie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Fenwick, Carrie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carrington Mortgage Holdings for Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.. (Fenwick, Carrie)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 6/18/2019. (cmd)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley, (case number 19-C-189), filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. Filing Fee $400 PAID - Receipt #0424-2839265. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Attachment State Court file)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engle v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Carrie Goodwin Fenwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Engle
Represented By: Lydia C Milnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?