Patillar v. Gomez
Petitioner: Calvin Patillar
Respondent: C. Gomez
Case Number: 3:2019cv00118
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001562 (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 copy of envelope, #3 Envelope) (tlg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/21/2019. (tlg)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/19/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Calvin Patillar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Calvin Patillar. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING and #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 07/29/2019. (cwm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/25/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Calvin Patillar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Calvin Patillar. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against C. Gomez, filed by Calvin Patillar. (Attachments: #1 memorandum, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patillar v. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Calvin Patillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?