Williams v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Williams
Defendant: New Penn Motor Express, LLC and Douglas R. Edwards, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00120
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Dewayne Williams PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT DOUGLAS R. EDWARDS, JR.'S, REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION TO PLAINTIFF. (Schultz, Lawrence)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas R. Edwards, Jr Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (McCartney, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Penn Motor Express, LLC Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (McCartney, John)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas R. Edwards, Jr Response to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (McCartney, John)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/10/2019. (tlg)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 09/05/2019. (cwm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Michael Dewayne Williams OF DEPOSITION OF DOUGLAS R. EDWARDS, JR. (Schultz, Lawrence)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by New Penn Motor Express, LLC Certificate of Service to Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff, Michael DeWayne Williams. (Washington, Alonzo)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Scheduling Order Checklist Other Document re #8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Scheduling Order Checklist)(Washington, Alonzo)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Washington, Alonzo)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Douglas R. Edwards, Jr First Set of Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Admission to Plaintiff (Washington, Alonzo)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED STATE COURT RECORD from Circuit Court of Berkeley County. (McCartney, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (Washington, Alonzo)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Douglas R. Edwards, Jr, New Penn Motor Express, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Washington, Alonzo)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/29/2019. (cmd)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Change of Address by John T. McCartney (McCartney, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, WV, (case number 19-C-235), filed by New Penn Motor Express, LLC, and Douglas R. Edwards, Jr. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2865799. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing, #4 Exhibit D - WV Secretary of State Details, #5 Exhibit E - Consent to Removal, and #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Motor Express, LLC
Represented By: John T. McCartney
Represented By: Alonzo D Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R. Edwards, Jr.
Represented By: John T. McCartney
Represented By: Alonzo D Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dewayne Williams
Represented By: Lawrence M. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?