Johnson
Plaintiff: Albert Johnson
In Re: R. C. S.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00121
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/5/2019. (cmd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/1/2019. (cmd)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 7/31/2019. Copy mailed by cm,rrr to pls.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Mailed to pro se pls by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Albert Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: R. C. S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?