Johnson v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Harvey R. Johnson
Respondent: Warden Hudgins
Case Number: 3:2019cv00122
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/23/2019 per USPS website. (tlg)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/18/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Petition as Being Moot filed by Harvey R. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 Roseboro Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/11/2019. (tlg)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND ROSEBORO NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 9/6/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Petition as Being Moot by Hudgins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 with Attachments A, B, and C)(Reisenweber, Erin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order to Show Cause. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/12/2019. (tlg)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/9/2019. Copy to AUSA; copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number WVNM001532 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tlg)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 08/02/2019. (cwm)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Original notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Warden Hudgins, filed by Harvey R. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Continuation from Page 10, #2 Exhibit 1 - Incident Report, #3 Exhibit 2 - USG Memorandum, #4 Exhibit 3 - Approved Telephone Numbers, and #5 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Hudgins
Represented By: Helen Campbell Altmeyer
Represented By: Erin K. Reisenweber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harvey R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?