Osburn v. State of West Virginia
Petitioner: Timothy Mark Osburn, Jr.
Respondent: State of West Virginia
Case Number: 3:2019cv00126
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/20/2019. Copy retained in the event petitioner provides a mailing address. (cmd)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Mail sent to Timothy Mark Osburn, Jr. #3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING and #2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT - Return to Sender - Unable to Forward. (cwm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved 2254 Forms) Original notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original Notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against State of West Virginia, filed by Timothy Mark Osburn, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osburn v. State of West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Karen C. Villanueva-Matkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Mark Osburn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?