Vogt v. American Arbitration Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christina M. Vogt
Defendant: American Arbitration Association, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00130
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/11/2019. (cwm)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/11/2019. (cwm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF by American Arbitration Association, Inc. re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Printz, Charles)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Arbitration Association, Inc.. (Printz, Charles)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christina M. Vogt. (Attachments: #1 fax cover sheet).(tlg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 fax cover sheet).(tlg)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Printz, Jr on behalf of American Arbitration Association, Inc. (Printz, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble no longer assigned to case. (cwm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 08/27/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christina M. Vogt re: #1 Complaint. (cwm)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 08/12/2019. (cwm)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 08/12/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christina M. Vogt. Pleading was hand-delivered. (tlg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Arbitration Association, Inc., filed by Christina M. Vogt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). Pleading was hand-delivered.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogt v. American Arbitration Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Arbitration Association, Inc.
Represented By: Charles F. Printz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina M. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?