Seavolt v. Variform, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Keith Seavolt
Defendant: Charles John Zammit and Variform, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00136
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Keith Seavolt re #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Thompson, Susanne)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/10/2019. (cwm)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (White, Lucas)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (White, Lucas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Variform, Inc., Charles John Zammit.(White, Lucas)
September 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas R. White on behalf of Variform, Inc., Charles John Zammit (White, Lucas)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND THE ANSWER DEADLINE AND TO STAY DISCOVERY AND DISCOVERY-RELATED DEADLINES. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 09/13/2019. (cwm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Keith Seavolt, filed by Keith Seavolt.(Thompson, Susanne)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer And To Stay Discovery and Discovery-Related Case Management Deadlines by Variform, Inc., Charles John Zammit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Owen, Richard)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 08/28/2019. (cwm)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to J. Dowdy. (tlg)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Berkeley County, WV, (case number CC-02-2019-C-261), filed by Charles John Zammit, Variform, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, state court complaint; #2 Exhibit 2, Secretary of State document; #3 Exhibit 3, notice of service of process; #4 Exhibit 4, state summons; #5 Exhibit 5, state court documents; #6 Civil Cover Sheet). Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2886409(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seavolt v. Variform, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles John Zammit
Represented By: Joseph S. Dowdy
Represented By: Richard D. Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Variform, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph S. Dowdy
Represented By: Richard D. Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Seavolt
Represented By: Susanne E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?