Frost v. Huggin
Petitioner: Roderick Devon Frost
Respondent: R. Huggin
Case Number: 3:2019cv00143
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 COURT-APPROVED FORM re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Roderick Devon Frost. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Petition, and #2 Envelope)(cwm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Filing fee: $5.00 - receipt number WVNC002709. (cwm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Roderick Devon Frost. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, and #2 Envelope)(cwm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roderick Devon Frost. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING AND DISMISS ACTION. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/12/2019. (cwm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/09/2019. (cwm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING AND DISMISS ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 09/06/2019. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved 2241 Form) Copy of order and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Forms) Original notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Exceed the Page Limit by Roderick Devon Frost. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Roderick Devon Frost to Clerk's Office re: filing fee as to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Roderick Devon Frost. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R. Huggin, filed by Roderick Devon Frost. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, and #2 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. Huggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roderick Devon Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Huggin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?