Coleman v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Stye Lamar Coleman
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Case Number: 3:2019cv00150
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Stye Lamar Coleman to District Court regarding #11 Filing Fee Received. (Attachments: #1 Order, and #2 Envelope)(cwm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 Filing fee: $5.00 - receipt number WVNM001590. (cwm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #9 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/11/2019. (cwm)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/01/2019. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 09/19/2019. (cwm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stye Lamar Coleman. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Address is current in CM/ECF per envelope attached. (cwm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Stye Lamar Coleman. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stye Lamar Coleman. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against R. Hudgins, Warden, filed by Stye Lamar Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Additional Petition, and #2 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stye Lamar Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?