Sweeris v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James B. Sweeris
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC and Does 1 to 50
Case Number: 3:2019cv00174
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/7/2019. (tlg)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/20/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Mail sent to James B. Sweeris #3 Notice (Other) Returned as Undeliverable (unclaimed). (tlg)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/25/2019. (tlg)
October 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble no longer assigned to case per #5 order. (tlg)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/23/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 10/17/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James B. Sweeris. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Does 1 to 50, filed by James B. Sweeris. (Attachments: #1 waiver of the service of summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope).(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeris v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Sweeris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?