Rice v. Hazelton USP et al
Plaintiff: Joenell Rice
Defendant: Hazelton USP mail room, Hazelton USP and Warden Antonnelly (sic)
Case Number: 3:2019cv00178
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order Dismissing Case. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/12/2019. (tlg)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/9/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/9/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Joenell Rice to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/24/2019. (tlg)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO DISMISS. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Warden Antonnelly (sic), Hazelton USP, Hazelton USP mail room, filed by Joenell Rice. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 letter, #3 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and LC Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Hazelton USP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazelton USP mail room
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazelton USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Antonnelly (sic)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joenell Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?