Simpson v. McCabe et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Russell Simpson
Defendant: Breece, Santiago, Edwards, Unknown Captain of Oklahoma City FTC, C. Gomez, S. Moore, David Rudy, O'Cain, G. Hornkohl, Warden Hayes, North, Fullen, Jeremy Lyon, Whitley, Dulla, Layhue, A. McCabe, Wolever, Unknown Warden of Oklahoma City FTC, Mays, John B. Fox, E. Dodrill, Guinn, Barkaszi, Tejera, B. Plavi, Foisey, D. K. Williams, Cruz and Rebecca Stacy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00217
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 25 Initial Partial Filing fee: $113.35 - receipt number WVNE015016. (cwm)
February 7, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Submit Additional Pages by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Additional pages, #2 Memorandum in Support of the Complaint, #3 Envelope)(cmd)
February 7, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Amended Complaint, by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Third Amended Complaint, #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope)(cmd)
February 4, 2020 Filing 22 RETURN RECEIPT as to #18 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/31/2020. (tlg)
February 4, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN RECEIPT as to #19 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/31/2020. (tlg)
January 28, 2020 Filing 20 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barkaszi, Breece, E. Dodrill, Dulla, Edwards, Foisey, John B. Fox, Fullen, C. Gomez, Guinn, Hayes, G. Hornkohl, Layhue, Jeremy Lyon, Mays, A. McCabe, S. Moore, North, O'Cain, B. Plavi, David Rudy, Santiago, Tejera, Unknown Captain of Oklahoma City FTC, Unknown Warden of Oklahoma City FTC, Whitley, D. K. Williams, Wolever, Rebecca Stacy, and Cruz, filed by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachment: #1 Memorandum In Support) Filed per #19 Order. (cwm)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 01/28/2020. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 01/28/2020. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR; copy order and consent email/mailed to E. Howell and Trustee Clerk FCI Loretto. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 second amended complaint, #2 jurisdiction and venue, #3 memorandum of law, #4 cover letter, #5 Envelope). (Attachment #3 did not include a page 16.) File-stamped copy was sent to Plaintiff by Clarksburg deputy clerk as requested.(tlg) Modified: attachment 17-2 is STRICKEN per #19 Order dated 01/28/2020 (cwm).
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Ledger sheets)(cmd)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Jesse Russell Simpson. (cmd)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse Russell Simpson. (cmd)
January 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Grounds)(cmd)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(cmd)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 01/02/2020. (cwm)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING, #9 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE EXCESS PAGES and #8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 01/02/2020. (cwm)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE EXCESS PAGES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/30/2019. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form, complaint). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 12/30/2019. Copy of order and blank PTAR form sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2019: #1 Court-Approved Form) (tlg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2019: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Mailed to pro se pls by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
December 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment excess pages)(cmd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Jesse Russell Simpson. (cmd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets)(cmd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jesse Russell Simpson. (cmd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jesse Russell Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Part 1, #2 Attachment Part 2, #3 Attachment Part 3, #4 Attachment Part 4, #5 Attachment Part 5, #6 Attachment Part 6, #7 Attachment Part 7, #8 Envelope)(cmd) Modified on 12/27/2019 Document restricted per Chief Judge Groh as some attachments violate E-Govt. Act (cmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. McCabe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Captain of Oklahoma City FTC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Hornkohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layhue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Warden of Oklahoma City FTC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barkaszi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tejera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Plavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. K. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Russell Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?