Clinton v. Hudgins
Petitioner: Gregory K. Clinton
Respondent: Mr. Hudgins
Case Number: 3:2020cv00073
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: William B Traxler
2 Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend 2241 Habeas Corpus "add ground five" re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Gregory K. Clinton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Letter, #2 Attachment Sentence Monitoring, #3 Envelope)(cwm) Modified: attachment 2 restricted due violating egov act per GMG Chambers (DW) on 6/25/2020 (cwm).
June 18, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER from Gregory K. Clinton to Clerk of Court. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
June 18, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER from Gregory Clinton to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Gregory K. Clinton re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION Writ of Coram Nobis by Gregory K. Clinton. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Identify the Counts that are in the Second Amended Petition by Gregory K. Clinton. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM 'Obstructing Justice' by Gregory K. Clinton re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 06/04/2020. (cwm)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 05/29/2020. Copy mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gregory K. Clinton. (cwm)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Gregory K. Clinton. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets, and #2 Envelope)(cwm)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory K. Clinton. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 Other Document filed by Gregory K. Clinton. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee: $5.00 - receipt number WVNM001683. (cwm)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Other Document re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gregory K. Clinton. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING and #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 05/08/2020. (cwm)
April 30, 2020 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble added. Chief Judge William B. Traxler, Jr. no longer assigned to case. (cwm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved Form) Original notice and forms mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE COURT by Gregory K. Clinton. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Hudgins, filed by Gregory K. Clinton. (Attachments: #1 Extended Restitations, #2 Exhibit A - Sentence Monitoring, #3 Exhibit 1 - Transcript, #4 Exhibit 2 - Transcript, #5 Exhibit 3 - Letter, #6 Exhibit 4 - Letter, #7 Exhibit 5 - Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit 6 - Warrant, and #9 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clinton v. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. Hudgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory K. Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?