West v. Sears
Petitioner: Richard West
Respondent: Sears
Case Number: 3:2020cv00126
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #8 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 08/03/2020. (cwm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 Supplement re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Richard West. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Certificate of Service, and #5 Envelope)(cwm)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard West. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Address has been updated in CM/ECF. (cwm)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 7/31/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 07/20/2020. (cwm)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Original notice mailed to pro se petitioner by CMRR. (cwm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $5.00 - receipt number WVNW002508. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (cwm)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard West. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Form is blank. Address that was used was on envelope. (cwm)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Richard West. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard West. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(cwm)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Sears, filed by Richard West. (Attachment: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope) Magistrate Judge Robert Trumble and PSLC B. Sims assigned. (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sears
Represented By: Karen C. Villanueva-Matkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?