Ortiz v. Antonelli
Petitioner: Rafael Tormes Ortiz
Respondent: Bryan Antonelli
Case Number: 3:2020cv00154
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Filing fee: $5.00 - receipt number WVNC003018. (cwm)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/28/2020 per USPS website. (tlg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/27/2020. (tlg)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO PAY THE $5.00 FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 8/25/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Petitioner. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Rafael Tormes Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rafael Tormes Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Bryan Antonelli, filed by Rafael Tormes Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 cover letter, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan Antonelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rafael Tormes Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?