Walton v. Shiflet et al
Plaintiff: Tony Jerome Walton
Defendant: Tom Harlem, Rick Haddix, Brian Shiflet, Michael Jackson and Jessica Sweaker
Case Number: 3:2020cv00191
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 11/25/2020. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
November 23, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michael Jackson served on 11/13/2020. (cmd)
November 19, 2020 Filing 16 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rick Haddix, Brian Shiflet, Jessica Sweaker and Michael Jackson.(Murray, William) Modified on 11/24/2020 to add defendant Michael Jackson NEF regen. (cmd)
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rick Haddix served on 11/2/2020. (cmd)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jessica Sweaker served on 11/6/2020. (cmd)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brian Shiflet served on 10/5/2020. (cmd)
November 3, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order to Answer. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/26/2020. (cmd)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO ANSWER OR FILE OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/21/2020. Copy to pro se pls by cm,rrr.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
October 20, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 83.15, receipt number WVNM001739 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cmd)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/9/2020. (cmd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/5/2020. (cmd)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 10/6/2020. Copy to pro se pls by cm,rrr. Copy with Consent to FIn. Deputy Clerk and Trustee Clerk.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Mailed to pro se pls by cmrrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tony Jerome Walton. (Attachments: #1 Ledger Sheets)(cmd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Tony Jerome Walton. (cmd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Jerome Walton. (cmd)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rick Haddix, Tom Harlem, Michael Jackson, Brian Shiflet, Jessica Sweaker, filed by Tony Jerome Walton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Statement of Claim, #2 Attachment Grievance, #3 Envelope)(cmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walton v. Shiflet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Jerome Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Harlem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Haddix
Represented By: Mark J McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Shiflet
Represented By: Mark J McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jackson
Represented By: Mark J McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Sweaker
Represented By: Mark J McGhee
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?