Whyte v. Skinner et al
Plaintiff: Steven Craig Whyte
Defendant: Lieutenant Barrientos, D. McIntyre, Hunt, Lieutenant Barber, A. Moyers, Lieutenant Abdellaz, Officer R. Skinner and Officer Stickney
Case Number: 3:2021cv00009
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/12/2021. (tlg)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION #9 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COURT-APPROVED FORM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 3/9/2021. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document by Steven Craig Whyte. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
February 23, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/17/2021. (tlg)
February 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING AND DISMISS ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 2/5/2021. Copy of order and Bivens packet sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/25/2021. (tlg)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Steven Craig Whyte. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Steven Craig Whyte. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Craig Whyte. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abdellaz, Barber, Barrientos, Hunt, D. McIntyre, A. Moyers, R. Skinner, Stickney, filed by Steven Craig Whyte. (Attachments: #1 grievances and responses, #2 complaint, #3 cover letter, #4 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2021: #5 administrative remedy appeal) (tlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whyte v. Skinner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Barrientos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Moyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Abdellaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer R. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stickney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Craig Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?