Mitter et al v. Glover et al
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Mitter
Defendant: Lester E. Specht, Bradley Halladay, E.K. Bare & Sons, Inc., Linda Good, Scott Wagner Trucking, Inc. doing business as S. Wagner Trucking, Inc., Lester Specht, Ragen Horst, Triple C Transportation Limited Liability Company doing business as Triple C Transportation LLC, Robert Horst and Christopher Allen Glover
Case Number: 3:2021cv00013
Filed: January 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 45 RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased), Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Skinner, Stephen)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO OPPOSE DEFENDANT SPECHT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 3/26/2021. (tlg)
March 25, 2021 Filing 43 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased), Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Skinner, Stephen)
March 25, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Irene Ashton Empson on behalf of E.K. Bare & Sons, Inc. (Empson, Danielle)
March 25, 2021 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased), Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor) . (Skinner, Stephen)
March 22, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Lester E. Specht. Responses due by 4/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lester Specht, #3 Exhibit B - Google Maps - John M. Seay Farms to Utz Quality Foods)(Mayhew, Jonathan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by Christopher Allen Glover, Scott Wagner Trucking, Inc., Triple C Transportation Limited Liability Company.(Smith, Timothy)
March 18, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Olds on behalf of Lester E. Specht (Olds, Evan)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S CONSENT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO OPPOSE DEFENDANTS' PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 03/15/2021. (cwm)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 03/15/2021. (cwm)
March 12, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased), Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Skinner, Stephen)
March 5, 2021 Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.K. Bare & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jones, Ellen)
March 5, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by E.K. Bare & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law)(Bolen, J.)
March 5, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by E.K. Bare & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bolen, J.)
March 5, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased), Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor) (Skinner, Stephen)
February 28, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by E.K. Bare & Sons, Inc.. (Bolen, J.)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 02/26/2021. (cwm)
February 25, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles F. Printz, Jr on behalf of Lester E. Specht (Printz, Charles)
February 25, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Lester E. Specht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Mayhew, Jonathan)
February 25, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Tyler Mayhew on behalf of Lester E. Specht (Mayhew, Jonathan)
February 24, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased), Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor) Certificate Regarding Discovery. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 23, 2021 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased), Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Christopher Allen Glover and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Scott Wagner Trucking d/b/a S. Wagner Trucking, Inc.. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 2/23/2021. (tlg)
February 19, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Christopher Allen Glover, Scott Wagner Trucking, Inc., Triple C Transportation Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hettrich, Jordan)
February 19, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scott Wagner Trucking, Inc.. (Hettrich, Jordan)
February 19, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Triple C Transportation Limited Liability Company. (Hettrich, Jordan)
February 17, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Robert Horst served on 2/9/2021. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 17, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ragen Horst served on 2/8/2021. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 17, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Linda Good served on 2/8/2021. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 17, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lester E. Specht served on 2/8/2021. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to E.K. Bare & Sons, Inc. served on 2/8/2021. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bradley Halladay served on 2/8/2021. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 10, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan C. Hettrich on behalf of Christopher Allen Glover, Scott Wagner Trucking, Inc., Triple C Transportation Limited Liability Company (Hettrich, Jordan)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Smith on behalf of Christopher Allen Glover, Scott Wagner Trucking, Inc., Triple C Transportation Limited Liability Company (Smith, Timothy)
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Scott Wagner Trucking, Inc. served on 2/2/2021. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Triple C Transportation Limited Liability Company served on 2/2/2021. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Christopher Allen Glover served on 2/8/2021. (Skinner, Stephen)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 02/05/2021. (cwm)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $400.00 - receipt number WVNM001786 for attorneys Kenneth Laduca and Peter Grenier. (cwm)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to Appear - Other Document re #2 Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission of Peter C. Grenier filed by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased), Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor). (Skinner, Stephen) Modified: to correct event used and regenerate NEF on 2/4/2021 (cwm).
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 Motion to Appear - Other Document re #2 Notice of Verification of Attorney Admission of Kenneth LaDuca filed by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased), Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor). (Skinner, Stephen) Modified: to correct event used and regenerate NEF on 2/4/2021 (cwm).
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for attorneys Kenneth J. LaDuca and Peter C. Grenier. Delivered via CM/ECF. (cwm)
January 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against E.K. Bare & Sons, Inc., Christopher Allen Glover, Linda Good, Bradley Halladay, Ragen Horst, Robert Horst, Scott Wagner Trucking, Inc., Lester E. Specht, and Triple C Transportation Limited Liability Company, filed by Elisabeth Mitter(as Administratrix of the Estate of JOHN EVERETT KING III, deceased) and Elisabeth Mitter(individuallly, as parent of B.K., a minor). Filing Fee $402.00 - Receipt #0424-3192859. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter of Administration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitter et al v. Glover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester E. Specht
Represented By: Charles F. Printz, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Mayhew
Represented By: Evan Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Halladay
Represented By: J. David Bolen
Represented By: Ellen Marie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. Bare & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: J. David Bolen
Represented By: Danielle Irene Ashton Empson
Represented By: Ellen Marie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wagner Trucking, Inc. doing business as S. Wagner Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Represented By: Jordan C. Hettrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Specht
Represented By: Charles F. Printz, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Tyler Mayhew
Represented By: Evan Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ragen Horst
Represented By: J. David Bolen
Represented By: Ellen Marie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple C Transportation Limited Liability Company doing business as Triple C Transportation LLC
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Represented By: Jordan C. Hettrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Horst
Represented By: J. David Bolen
Represented By: Ellen Marie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Allen Glover
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Represented By: Jordan C. Hettrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Mitter
Represented By: Kenneth J. LaDuca
Represented By: Peter C. Grenier
Represented By: Stephen G. Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?