Cantrell v. Strong et al
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Cantrell
Defendant: Reggie Sellers, Jeremy Killgore, Spencer Patterson, Chad Richmond, Tony Stocklasp, Justin Wade, Shawn Strong, Drake Williams, Karen Pszczolkowski, Richard McKeen and Russell Cook
Case Number: 3:2021cv00015
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/18/2021 per USPS website. (tlg)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 COURT-APPROVED FORM re #1 Complaint, filed by Larry Wayne Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 grievance forms, #2 cover letter, #3 Envelope).(tlg)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Larry Wayne Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 2/5/2021 per USPS website. (tlg)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING AND INTENT TO STRIKE PLEADING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 1/29/2021. Copy of order and court-approved forms sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2021: #1 Court-Approved Form) (cmd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Larry Wayne Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 ledger sheets, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Wayne Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Russell Cook, Jeremy Killgore, Richard McKeen, Spencer Patterson, Karen Pszczolkowski, Chad Richmond, Reggie Sellers, Tony Stocklasp, Shawn Strong, Justin Wade, Drake Williams, filed by Larry Wayne Cantrell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, disciplinary incident report; #2 Exhibit B, disciplinary incident report; #3 Exhibit C, patient note; #4 cover letter; #5 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims. File-stamped copy sent to Plaintiff. (tlg) Modified on 1/28/2021 to seal attachment #3 per LC Sims (tlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Strong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Killgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Stocklasp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Pszczolkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard McKeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wayne Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?