Wilkerson v. Paugh et al
Plaintiff: Steven Ray Wilkerson
Defendant: Scott Paugh, Betsy C. Jividen and Lt. Bray
Case Number: 3:2021cv00054
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 21 Mail sent to Steven Ray Wilkerson #20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE- Unable to Forward - No Longer Here. (cwm)
May 30, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Complete information regarding the WVND NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found #here.Currently, many attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. This will no longer be allowed with the New WVND NextGen CM/ECF system because each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to their e-filing account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WVND e-filing attorneys once the WVND NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one is to upgrade your PACER account, and step two is to link your upgraded PACER account to the WVND e-filing account in the upgraded NextGen CM/ECF system. This notice only addresses the first step because the second step cant be completed until on or after July 19, 2021. The first step is to check and see if your PACER account is an upgraded PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have un upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the WVND NextGen CM/ECF upgrade occurs on July 19, 2021: 1) You have a an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court; or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WVND CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Additional notices will be sent later detailing how to handle the second step in this process. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 5/26/2021. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
May 24, 2021 Filing 19 Mail sent to Steven Ray Wilkerson #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Steven Ray Wilkerson Returned as Undeliverable (no longer at facility). (tlg)
May 24, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN RECEIPT as to #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Steven Ray Wilkerson. SERVICE EXPECTED on 5/24/2021 per USPS website. (tlg)
May 6, 2021 Filing 17 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Steven Ray Wilkerson. (Attachments: #1 resident activity report/ledger sheet, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
April 30, 2021 Filing 16 Mail sent to Steven Ray Wilkerson #12 Order, Returned as Undeliverable (no longer at facility). (tlg)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION OR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 4/27/2021. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/28/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 Mail sent to Steven Ray Wilkerson #10 Order on Motion to Seal, Returned as Undeliverable (no longer at facility). (tlg)
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew R. Whitler on behalf of All Defendants (Whitler, Matthew)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 4/21/2021. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION 9 TO SEAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 4/20/2021. Copy emailed to counsel; copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Stephen Weiler on behalf of All Defendants (Weiler, Mark)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 4/16/2021. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy faxed to Attorney General for the State of WV and Civil Rights Division of the office of Attorney General. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
April 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 4/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Form). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff; copy to ERJ.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER from Steven Ray Wilkerson to Clerk regarding #1 Complaint filed by Steven Ray Wilkerson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 ** SEALED ** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Steven Ray Wilkerson. (Attachments: #1 note, #2 Envelope).(tlg)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 ** SEALED ** Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account by Steven Ray Wilkerson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Ray Wilkerson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lt. Bray, Betsy C. Jividen, Scott Paugh, filed by Steven Ray Wilkerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, declaration of James Buchanan; #2 cover letter; #3 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and law clerk Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson v. Paugh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Paugh
Represented By: Matthew R. Whitler
Represented By: Mark Stephen Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy C. Jividen
Represented By: Matthew R. Whitler
Represented By: Mark Stephen Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Bray
Represented By: Matthew R. Whitler
Represented By: Mark Stephen Weiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ray Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?