Boggs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Laura Catherine Boggs
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv00094
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael John Aloi
Referring Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2021 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia (WVND) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on July 19, 2021. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your WVND e-filing account in the new NextGen CM/ECF system on or after July 19, 2021. Instructions for linking your account can be found #here. PLEASE NOTE: The WVND CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 1:00 pm on Friday July 16, 2021 until 8:00 am Monday, July 19, 2021. An extension for electronic filing will be granted for all documents with court-imposed deadlines falling between 1:00 pm on Friday, July 16, 2021, and midnight on Sunday, July 18, 2021. All documents due during that period must be filed prior to 1:00 pm Friday, July 16, 2021, or on Monday, July 19, 2021. If you have any additional questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856 or the WVND Clerks Office CM/ECF Help Desk at (304) 267-5682. (cmd) (ADI)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General of the United States. (cwm)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security. (cmd)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to NDWV Attorney served on 7/6/2021. (cmd)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan McKee (USA) on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (McKee (USA), Morgan)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 Pro hac vice filing fee as to Laura Boggs: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002774 (tlg)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 6/28/2021. (tlg)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Laura Catherine Boggs. (Bailey, Brian)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES AND AFFIDAVIT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 06/22/2021. (cwm)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laura Catherine Boggs. (cwm)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Laura Catherine Boggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Office of Regional Chief Counsel, #3 Summons - U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons - USA NDWV)(cwm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boggs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Catherine Boggs
Represented By: Brian D. Bailey
Represented By: Dana W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Morgan McKee (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?