Spence v. City of Martinsburg, West Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Winston L. Spence, Jr.
Defendant: City of Martinsburg, West Virginia, Chief Maury Richards, Patrolman N. Cook and John Doe(s) 1-3
Case Number: 3:2021cv00126
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Winston L. Spence, Jr. Address updated. (hand delivered). (cmd)
September 23, 2021 Filing 16 Mail sent to Winston L. Spence, Jr. #12 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SPECIAL ACCOMMODATION. Returned: Returned to Sender - Not Deliverable As Addressed - Unable to Forward. (cwm)
September 13, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN RECEIPT as to #12 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/10/2021. (cmd)
September 7, 2021 Filing 14 Mail sent to Winston L. Spence, Jr. #4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Returned: Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. (cwm)
September 7, 2021 Filing 13 Mail sent to Winston L. Spence, Jr. #9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION [ECF No. 2] FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS. Returned: Return to Sender - Attempted Not Known - Unable to Forward. (cwm)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SPECIAL ACCOMMODATION. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 09/03/2021. (cwm) Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 Mail sent to Winston L. Spence, Jr. #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Return to Sender - Vacant - Unable to Forward. (cwm)
August 26, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT and #4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 08/23/2021. (cwm)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION [ECF No. 2] FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED INFORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 08/25/2021. (cwm) Copy to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to the Court by Winston L. Spence, Jr receipt of #4 Order of Referral. (cmd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION: Request for Order Modification re #4 Referral Order, by Winston L. Spence, Jr. (hand delivered) (cmd)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for a Special Accommodation in Current Document Delivery Method to the Plaintiff by Winston L. Spence, Jr. (Hand delivered)(cmd)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Mail sent to Winston L. Spence, Jr. #3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. (cwm) Document re-mailed with correct address (zip code).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 08/11/2021. (cwm) Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Mailed by cm,rrr. (cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2021: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2021: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Winston L. Spence, Jr. (Hand delivered) (cmd)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Martinsburg, West Virginia, N. Cook, John Doe(s) 1-3, Maury Richards, filed by Winston L. Spence, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(cmd) Modified on 7/30/2021 (Hand delivered) (cmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spence v. City of Martinsburg, West Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston L. Spence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Martinsburg, West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Maury Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrolman N. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s) 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?