Johnson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Harvey R. Johnson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00056
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina Marie Groh
Referring Judge: Robert W Trumble
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 9 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (non prisoner) by Harvey R. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cmd)
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 ORDER TERMINATING MOTION AS MOOT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 05/02/2022. (cwm)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TERMINATING MOTION AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 04/25/2022. (Attachment: #1 Court-Approved IFP Form)(cwm) Order and form mailed to pro se plaintiff by CMRR. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/25/2022: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cwm).
April 22, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Clarification re: #3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING by Harvey R. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bank Statements, #2 Envelope)(cwm) Attachment 1 restricted do to e-gov violations per GMG Chambers (WB).
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING and #4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 04/01/2022 per USPS website. (cwm)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2022: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING. (Attachments: #1 Court-Approved Forms). Sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff.(tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2022: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Harvey R. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(tlg)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Harvey R. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment continued from section VI, #2 Envelope). Case assigned to MJ Robert Trumble and PSLC Sims.(tlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvey R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?