King v. Chronister et al
Plaintiff: Cathy King
Defendant: N. Chronister, Berkeley County Sheriff's Department, Berkeley County Commission, City of Martinsburg, City of Charles Town, Ronald Kerns, City of Ranson, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, John Doe #3, John Doe #4, John Doe #5, John Doe #6, John Doe #7, John Doe #8 and John Doe #9
Case Number: 3:2024cv00019
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Charles Town, John Doe #6, John Doe #7, Ronald Kerns. (Olds, Evan)
April 9, 2024 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cathy King. (Atkinson, John-Mark)
April 4, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cathy King. (Atkinson, John-Mark)
April 4, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cathy King. (Atkinson, John-Mark)
April 3, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cathy King. (Atkinson, John-Mark)
April 1, 2024 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support by N. Chronister re #12 MOTION to Dismiss . (Strider, Adam)
April 1, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by N. Chronister. (Strider, Adam)
March 26, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by City of Ranson re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Gamble, Keith)
March 26, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Ranson. (Gamble, Keith)
March 21, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by City of Martinsburg re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Gamble, Keith)
March 21, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Martinsburg. (Gamble, Keith)
March 21, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith C. Gamble on behalf of City of Martinsburg (Gamble, Keith)
March 21, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Charles Town, John Doe #6, John Doe #7, Ronald Kerns. (Olds, Evan)
March 21, 2024 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support by Berkeley County Commission, Berkeley County Sheriff's Department re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Strider, Adam)
March 21, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Berkeley County Commission, Berkeley County Sheriff's Department. (Strider, Adam)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Charles Town, John Doe #6, John Doe #7, Ronald Kerns. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Olds, Evan)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against N. Chronister, a deputy sheriff of Berkeley County; Berkeley County Sheriff's Department, a division of the Berkeley County Commission; Berkeley County Commission, a political subdivision of Berkeley County, West Virginia; City of Martinsburg, a municipal corporation; City of Charles Town, a municipal corporation; Ronald Kerns, a police officer for the City of Charles Town; City of Ranson, a municipal corporation; John Doe #1, a law enforcement officer; John Doe #2, a deputy sheriff or sheriff of Berkeley County; John Doe #3, a deputy sheriff or sheriff of Berkeley County; John Doe #4, a police officer for the City of Martinsburg; John Doe #5, a police officer for the City of Martinsburg; John Doe #6, a police officer for the City of Charles Town; John Doe #7, a police officer for the City of Charles Town; John Doe #8, a police officer for the City of Ranson; John Doe #9, a police officer for the City of Ranson, filed by Cathy King. Filing Fee $405 - Receipt #AWVNDC-3884019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(je)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Chronister et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy King
Represented By: John-Mark Atkinson
Represented By: Mark A. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Chronister
Represented By: Adam Ketner Strider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Adam Ketner Strider
Represented By: James W. Marshall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkeley County Commission
Represented By: Adam Ketner Strider
Represented By: James W. Marshall, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Martinsburg
Represented By: Keith C. Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charles Town
Represented By: Evan Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Kerns
Represented By: Evan Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ranson
Represented By: Keith C. Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #6
Represented By: Evan Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #7
Represented By: Evan Olds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?