Givens v. Main Street Financial Services Corp. et al
Plaintiff: |
Greg Givens |
Defendant: |
Main Street Financial Services Corp., Rebecca Randolph, Richard Lucas, William Criswell, Kevin Gessler, Keith C. Gamble, Pullin, Fowler, Flanagan, Brown & Poe, PLLC and City of Wheeling, West Virginia |
Case Number: |
5:2010cv00027 |
Filed: |
March 1, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia |
Office: |
Wheeling Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Frederick P. Stamp |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 28, 2010 |
Filing
128
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PARTTHE PLAINTIFFS 17 MOTION FOR REMAND AND FOR SANCTIONS; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS KEITH C. GAMBLE AND PULLIN, FOWLER, FLANAGAN, BROWN & POES 10 MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS REBECCA RANDOLPH, RICHARD LUCAS, AND MAIN STREET BANKS 12 MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANTS CITY OF WHEELING,WEST VIRGINIA, WILLIAM CRISWELL,AND KEVIN GESSLERS 24 MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING WITHO UT PREJUDICE THE DEFENDANTS 29 JOINT MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF GREG GIVENSRESPONSE TO DEFENDANT JOINT REPLY TO PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS; DENYING AS MOOT THE PLAINTIFFS 59 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND RESERVATION OF RIGHT TO DE NOVO REVIEW OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, OBJECTION TO ORDER, AND APPEAL TO SENIOR DISTRICT JUDGE STAMP; DENYING AS MOOT THE PLAINTIFFS 60 MOTION TO [SIC] RECONSIDERATION TO ESTABLISH A PRO BONO PANEL TO APPOINT ATTORNEY TO REPRESENT UNREPRESE NTED PARTY IN FEDERAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASES; DENYING AS MOOT THE PLAINTIFFS 111 MOTION FOR RECUSAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE; VACATING MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAULLS 71 AUGUST 12, 2010 ORDER; VACATING MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAULLS 81 SEPTEMBER 3, 2010 ORDER; AND VAC ATING THIS COURTS SEPTEMBER 15, 2010 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS. This case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Ohio County, West Virginia and is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. Clerk directed to enter judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/28/10. (c to pro se plaintiff by certified mail, c to Clerk, Circuit Court of Ohio County, c to USCA)(cc)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
90
ORDER/OPINION: Defendant's 76 Motion to Stay Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Kaull on 9/16/10. (c to pro se plaintiff by regular U.S. Mail, c to Judge)(cc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?