Murray Energy Corporation et al v. Administrator of Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: Murray Energy Corporation, Murray American Energy, Inc., The American Coal Company, The Harrison County Coal Company, KenAmerican Resources, Inc., The Marion County Coal Company, The Marshall County Coal Company, The Monongalia County Coal Company, OhioAmerican Energy, Inc., The Ohio County Coal Company, UtahAmerican Energy, Inc and American Energy Corporation
Defendant: Administrator of Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 5:2014cv00039
Filed: March 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Wheeling Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604 Clear Air Act (Emission Standards)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING THE UNITED STATES' NEW 204 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF THE PLAINTIFFS. 266 United States' First Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Related Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Anne E. Smith DENIED; 268 United States' Second Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Related Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, Timothy Considine DENIED; 270 United States' Third Motion in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Related Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, John Deskins DENIED. The defendant is ORDERED to file, within fourteen days of the date of this Order, a plan and schedule for compliance with § 321 (a) both generally and in the specific area of the effects of its regulations on the coal industry. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/17/16. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (lmm)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING 147 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND 155 MOTION TO STAY DEPOSITION. This Court will, however, stay the deposition of Administrator McCarthy until December 4, 2015. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/12/2015. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY. Accordingly, The United States Motion to Dismiss Due to Lack of Article III Standing, filed by the EPA on December 23, 2014 59 is DENIED, and the Motion of the United States to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motion and Request for Expedited Proceeding, filed by the EPA on the same date 61 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 3/27/2015. (copy to counsel of record via CM/ECF) (nmm)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING MOTION: Denying 34 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and MOTION to Strike Prayer for Injunctive Relief filed by Administrator of Environmental Protection Agency. Signed by Chief Judge John Preston Bailey on 9/16/14. (soa)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray Energy Corporation et al v. Administrator of Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Energy Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray American Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The American Coal Company
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Harrison County Coal Company
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KenAmerican Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Marion County Coal Company
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Marshall County Coal Company
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Monongalia County Coal Company
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OhioAmerican Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio County Coal Company
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UtahAmerican Energy, Inc
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Energy Corporation
Represented By: Geoffrey K. Barnes
Represented By: J. Van Carson
Represented By: John E. Jevicky
Represented By: John Lazzaretti
Represented By: Jacob A. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrator of Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Betsy Steinfeld Jividen
Represented By: Chloe H. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?