The Marshall County Coal Company et al v. Oliver et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: The Marshall County Coal Company, The Marion County Coal Company, The Monongalia County Coal Company, The Harrison County Coal Company, The Ohio County Coal Company, Murray Energy Corporation and Robert E. Murray
Defendant: John Oliver, Charles Wilson, Partially Important Productions, LLC, Home Box Office, Inc., Time Warner, Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Amicus: ACLU of West Virginia
Case Number: 5:2017cv00099
Filed: June 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Wheeling Office
County: Marshall
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae, filed by the ACLU of West Virginia 26 , and the Motion for Leave to File Separate Motions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 or, Alternatively, for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation of Twenty-Five Pages and Memorandum in Support Thereof, filed by Defendants Home Box Office, Inc., Partially Important Productions, LLC, and Time Warner, Inc. 28 , are hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/11/2017. (ch)
August 10, 2017 Filing 33 LETTER from Deputy Clerk to Clerk, Circuit Court of Marshall County enclosing certified copy of docket sheet and 32 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. (copy to Circuit Clerk via US Mail; copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2017: # 1 Attachment copy of remand letter returned from Circuit Court of Marshall County) (nmm).
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 3 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [Doc. 21] is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. this action is hereby REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Marshall County, West Virginia. This case is hereby ORDERED STRICKEN from the active docket of this Court. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/10/2017. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF; copy to Clerk of Circuit Court of Marshall County via US Mail) (nmm)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER: For reasons appearing to the Court, the August 11, 2017, deadline 6 for Defendants Home Box Office, Inc., Time Warner, Inc., and Partially Important Productions, LLC, to answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint is hereby VACATED. The Defendants shall have until August 25, 2017, to do the same. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/9/2017. (ch)
August 8, 2017 Filing 30 OBJECTIONS Plaintiffs' Corrected Objection to the Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae to 26 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Robert E. Murray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Delk, David)
August 7, 2017 Filing 29 OBJECTIONS Plaintiffs' Objection to the Motion for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae to 26 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Robert E. Murray. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Grove, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2017 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Separate Motions Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 or, Alternatively, for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation of Twenty-Five Pages and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Home Box Office, Inc., Partially Important Productions, LLC, Time Warner, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzsimmons, Robert)
August 2, 2017 Filing 27 AMENDED DOCUMENT by ACLU of West Virginia. Amendment to 26 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae . (Crofts, Jamie)
August 1, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by ACLU of West Virginia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Crofts, Jamie)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael J. Barrie. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/31/2017. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric Baisden. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/31/2017. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William M. Alleman, Jr. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/31/2017. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
July 28, 2017 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiffs' Reply Regarding Their Motion for a Temproary Restraining Order filed by Robert E. Murray. (Grove, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2017 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support re 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Remand filed by Robert E. Murray. (Grove, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2017 Filing 19 PHV Filing fee for Attorneys Barrie, Baisden and Alleman: $ 600.00, receipt number WVNW001733 (lmm)
July 24, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Admission William M. Alleman,Jr. by Robert E. Murray. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Exhibit A)(Delk, David)
July 24, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Admission Eric Baisden by Robert E. Murray. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Delk, David)
July 24, 2017 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Admission Michael Barrie by Robert E. Murray. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Delk, David)
July 24, 2017 Filing 15 CLERK'S PAPERLESS NOTICE: Exhibit #2 (DVD) re 13 MEMORANDUM and Exhibits A and B (DVDs) re 14 Memorandum were delivered to the Wheeling Clerk's Office and have been placed in the Court's file. (kac)
July 21, 2017 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff's 21 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order by Home Box Office, Inc., Partially Important Productions, LLC, Time Warner, Inc. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit E (con'd), # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Fitzsimmons, Robert) Modified on 7/28/2017 to link to Motion (kac).
July 21, 2017 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Home Box Office, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Fitzsimmons, Robert)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin T. Baine. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/19/2017. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas G. Hentoff. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/19/2017. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
July 18, 2017 Filing 9 PHV Filing fee for Attorneys Hentoff and Baine, $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW001729. (lmm)
July 18, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kevin T. Baine by Home Box Office, Inc., Partially Important Productions, LLC, Time Warner, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzsimmons, Robert)
July 18, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thomas G. Hentoff by Home Box Office, Inc., Partially Important Productions, LLC, Time Warner, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzsimmons, Robert)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Home Box Office, Inc; Time Warner, Inc.; and Partially Important Productions, LLC are granted an extension of time until August 11, 2017 to answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/17/2017. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)
July 14, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint by Home Box Office, Inc., Partially Important Productions, LLC, Time Warner, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fitzsimmons, Robert)
July 7, 2017 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Robert E. Murray. (Delk, David)
July 7, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Murray Energy Corporation. (Delk, David)
June 30, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Robert E. Murray, Murray Energy Corporation, The Harrison County Coal Company, The Marion County Coal Company, The Marshall County Coal Company, The Monongalia County Coal Company, The Ohio County Coal Company. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Affidavit - Heather Santini, # 3 Affidavit - John Klayko, # 4 Affidavit - Robert E. Murray)(kac) (Motion was filed in Marshall County Circuit Court on 6/28/2017) (Judge Bailey's Chambers Notified)
June 30, 2017 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Box Office, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Time Warner, Inc. for Home Box Office, Inc... (Fitzsimmons, Robert)
June 30, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marshall County, WV, (case number 17-C-124), filed by Home Box Office, Inc. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2379785. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certified copies of all process, pleadings and orders from State Court, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Marshall County Coal Company et al v. Oliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Marshall County Coal Company
Represented By: William M. Alleman, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Baisden
Represented By: Michael J. Barrie
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Marion County Coal Company
Represented By: William M. Alleman, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Baisden
Represented By: Michael J. Barrie
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Monongalia County Coal Company
Represented By: William M. Alleman, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Baisden
Represented By: Michael J. Barrie
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Harrison County Coal Company
Represented By: William M. Alleman, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Baisden
Represented By: Michael J. Barrie
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio County Coal Company
Represented By: William M. Alleman, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Baisden
Represented By: Michael J. Barrie
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Energy Corporation
Represented By: William M. Alleman, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Baisden
Represented By: Michael J. Barrie
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Murray
Represented By: William M. Alleman, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Baisden
Represented By: Michael J. Barrie
Represented By: David L. Delk, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Grove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partially Important Productions, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Clayton J Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Box Office, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Clayton J Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin T. Baine
Represented By: Clayton J Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Robert P. Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Thomas G. Hentoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: ACLU of West Virginia
Represented By: Jamie Lynn Crofts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?