Bellon et al v. The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan et al
Plaintiff: Bernadot F. Veillon, Robert E. Eakin, Judy Gay Burke, Barbara Brown, Louise Nichols, Robert E. Williams, Wilton G. Wallace and Charles W. Bellon
Defendant: PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan and The PPG Plan Administrator
Case Number: 5:2018cv00114
Filed: July 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Office: Wheeling Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: Gina M Groh
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING JOINT #47 MOTION TO ENLARGE DISCOVERY PERIOD AND MOVE CASE DEADLINES. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 9/10/19. (lmm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Move Case Deadlines by Charles W. Bellon, Barbara Brown, Judy Gay Burke, Robert E. Eakin, Louise Nichols. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator for Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents. (Schroeder, Theodore)
August 27, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator for Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Second Set of Interrogatories. (Schroeder, Theodore)
July 22, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles W. Bellon, Barbara Brown, Judy Gay Burke, Robert E. Eakin, Louise Nichols PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DIRECTED TO DEFENDANTS PPG EMPLOYEE LIFE AND OTHER BENEFITS PLAN, PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., and THE PPG PLAN ADMINISTRATOR (Adams, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles W. Bellon, Barbara Brown, Judy Gay Burke, Robert E. Eakin, Louise Nichols PLAINTIFFS' SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. (Adams, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 5/6/19. (lmm)
May 3, 2019 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE by Charles W. Bellon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator for Defendants' Second Amended Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents. (Bergstrom, J.)
April 22, 2019 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator for Defendants' First Amended Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories. (Bergstrom, J.)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 4/8/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement, #3 Appendix)(lmm)
April 5, 2019 Filing 37 Proposed Protective Order by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator. (Bergstrom, J.)
April 5, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator for Defendants' First Amended Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents. (Bergstrom, J.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles W. Bellon, Barbara Brown, Judy Gay Burke, Robert E. Eakin, Louise Nichols, Bernadot F. Veillon, Wilton G. Wallace, Robert E. Williams (Certificate of Service for PLAINTIFFS ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES) (Adams, Michael)
February 11, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles W. Bellon, Barbara Brown, Judy Gay Burke, Robert E. Eakin, Louise Nichols, Bernadot F. Veillon, Wilton G. Wallace, Robert E. Williams (Certificate of Service for PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS) (Adams, Michael)
February 6, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator for Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents. (Bergstrom, J.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator for Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories. (Bergstrom, J.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator for First Request for Production of Documents (Bergstrom, J.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator for First Set of Interrogatories (Bergstrom, J.)
January 4, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles W. Bellon, Barbara Brown, Judy Gay Burke, Robert E. Eakin, Louise Nichols of Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to all Defendants (Adams, Michael)
January 4, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles W. Bellon, Barbara Brown, Judy Gay Burke, Robert E. Eakin, Louise Nichols of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to All Defendants (Adams, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Gina M. Groh on 12/10/18. (lmm)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: Case reassigned to Chief Judge Gina M. Groh for all further proceedings. District Judge John Preston Bailey no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/4/18. (soa)
November 23, 2018 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Bergstrom, J.)
October 18, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Change of Attorney Information Other Document filed by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator. (Fink, Brittany)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 11/9/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/23/2018. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 12/10/2018. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 10/9/18. (soa)
October 8, 2018 Filing 22 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator.(Fink, Brittany)
August 16, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION regarding Defendant The PPG Plan Administrator's answer by The PPG Plan Administrator. (Fink, Brittany)
August 15, 2018 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles W. Bellon. The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan waiver sent on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Adams, Michael)
August 15, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles W. Bellon. PPG Industries, Inc. waiver sent on 8/9/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Adams, Michael)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/15/18. (lmm)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 8/15/18. (lmm)
August 14, 2018 Filing 16 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Jasmine Fannell and Joseph Torres: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW001960 (nmm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator. (Fink, Brittany)
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph J. Torres by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fink, Brittany)
August 8, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jasmine A. D. Fannell by PPG Industries, Inc., The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan, The PPG Plan Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fink, Brittany)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Attorney Davidson-Welling. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/24/18. (lmm)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Attorney Stember. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 7/24/18. (lmm)
July 23, 2018 Filing 8 PHV Filing fee for Attorney Davidson-Welling and Stember $ 400.00, receipt number WVNW001944 (lmm)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John Stember by Charles W. Bellon. (Adams, Michael)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Maureen Davidson-Welling by Charles W. Bellon. (Adams, Michael)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for James T. Carney. (lmm)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Maureen Davidson-Welling. (lmm)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for John Stember. (lmm)
July 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Judy Gay Burke, Barbara Brown, Robert E. Williams, Charles W. Bellon, Robert E. Eakin, Louise Nichols, Bernadot F. Veillon, Wilton G. Wallace. Filing Fee $400 - Receipt #0424-2626069. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 9/26/16 Letter from William E. Adams, #2 Exhibit 2 - 9/8/16 Letter from John Stember, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10/6/16 Letter from John Stember, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2/2/17 Letter from John Stember, #5 Exhibit 5 - 10/26/16 letter from Michael A. Hart, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2/27/17 Letter from Michael A. Hart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellon et al v. The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadot F. Veillon
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Michael A. Adams
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: James T. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Eakin
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Michael A. Adams
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: James T. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Gay Burke
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Michael A. Adams
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: James T. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Brown
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Michael A. Adams
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: James T. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louise Nichols
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Michael A. Adams
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: James T. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Williams
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Michael A. Adams
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: James T. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilton G. Wallace
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Michael A. Adams
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: James T. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Bellon
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Michael A. Adams
Represented By: Maureen Davidson-Welling
Represented By: James T. Carney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jasmine A.D. Fannell
Represented By: Joseph J. Torres
Represented By: Brittany A. Fink
Represented By: Theodore A. Schroeder
Represented By: J. Todd Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The PPG Employee Life and Other Benefits Plan
Represented By: Jasmine A.D. Fannell
Represented By: Joseph J. Torres
Represented By: Brittany A. Fink
Represented By: Theodore A. Schroeder
Represented By: J. Todd Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The PPG Plan Administrator
Represented By: Jasmine A.D. Fannell
Represented By: Joseph J. Torres
Represented By: Brittany A. Fink
Represented By: Theodore A. Schroeder
Represented By: J. Todd Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?