White v. Homer Laughlin China Co.
Plaintiff: Calvin L. White
Defendant: Homer Laughlin China Co.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00151
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Mazzone
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 10/26/18. (soa)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 10/23/18. (soa)(copy to Pltff. by cert. mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice (Other). SERVICE ACCEPTED on 9/14/18. (soa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT re #1 Complaint mailed to Pltff. by cert. mail. (soa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (soa).
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Calvin L. White. (soa)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Homer Laughlin China Co., filed by Calvin L. White. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons-Orig. lodged in file)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Homer Laughlin China Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homer Laughlin China Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?