United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC v. Tecnocap LLC
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC
Defendant: Tecnocap LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00184
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Referring Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tecnocap LLC. Tecnocap LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Shafer, Bradley)
November 29, 2018 Cases associated: Create association to 5:18-cv-00156-JPB. (lmm)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. (Case associated with lead case 5:18-cv-156) Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 11/29/18. (lmm)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons (Cogan, Timothy)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION. Case reassigned to District Judge John Preston Bailey for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. no longer assigned to case Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 11/14/18. (lmm)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO ENFORCE HALL ARBITRATION AWARD against Tecnocap LLC, filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC.Filing Fee: $400.00 - Receipt Number #0424-2701386. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CBA, #2 Exhibit 3/27/18 Award, #3 Exhibit 7/18/18 Award, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC v. Tecnocap LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tecnocap LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial, and Service Workers International Union, AFL-CIO-CLC
Represented By: Timothy F. Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?