Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company et al v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wright-Connor and Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00192
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Defendant LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff. (Noel, Heather)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Joinder/Amendments due by 9/20/2019. Discovery due by 11/22/2019. Motions due by 12/6/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2020. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference set for 2/10/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Stamp Chambers before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 2/25/2020 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, South before Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp Jr. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 12/28/18. (lmm)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Noel, Heather)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Noel, Heather)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc..(Noel, Heather)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr. on 11/29/18. (lmm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 PHV Filing fee for Rahul Gogineni: $ 200.00, receipt number WVNW002041 (lmm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rahul Gogineni, Esq. by Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company, Elizabeth Wright-Connor. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jecklin, David)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING. It is ORDERED that LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. will have until December 10, 2018 to answer. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr, on 11/29/18. (lmm)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION To Extend Time To Answer or Otherwise File a Responsive Pleading by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (Noel, Heather)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather M. Noel on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (Noel, Heather)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 12/26/2018; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/2/2019; Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 1/23/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick P. Stamp, Jr on 11/26/2018. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF and US Mail as needed) (nmm) Modified docket text on 11/26/2018 re: service copies (nmm).
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF ATTORNEY ADMISSION for Attorney Gogineni. (counsel via US Mail) (lmm)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers from Circuit Court of Marshall County, (case number 18-C-243), filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. Filing Fee PAID $400 - Receipt #0424-2709329. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Secretary of State, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company et al v. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Wright-Connor
Represented By: Rahul Gogineni
Represented By: David M. Jecklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: Rahul Gogineni
Represented By: David M. Jecklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: John L. MacCorkle
Represented By: Heather M. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?