Ford v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: Ronald Ford
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 5:2018cv00208
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
0 Judge: James P Mazzone
1 Judge: Frederick P Stamp
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF FILING DOCUMENTS AS DIRECTED re #6 Order filed by Ronald Ford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(soa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/25/19(according to USPO Tracking) (soa)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Mail sent to Ronald Ford #5 Notice (Other) Returned as Undeliverable., RETURN RECEIPT SERVICE ACCEPTED - not served. (soa)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/18/19. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE DOCUMENTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. Mazzone on 1/18/19. (Pro Se Plaintiff via CM/rrr) (lmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (lmm).
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT. (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM,rrr; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2018: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 COURT-APPROVED FORM re #1 Complaint, filed by Ronald Ford. (Attachments: #1 Prescription Medicine List 7/7/2017, #2 BOP Medication List, #3 copy of Notice of Deficient Pleading sent, #4 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Court Approved Form) (copy to Pro Se Plaintiff via CM,rrr; copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2018: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (nmm).
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Ford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by Ronald Ford. (Attachments: #1 A - Adminstrative Remedies Pursuant to FTCA, #2 B - Prescription Medicine List 7/7/2017, #3 C - BOP Medication List, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope) (copy to Judge Stamp) (nmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?