Dubin v. Nationwide Mutual Insurace Company et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Durbin
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and John Doe(s)
Case Number: 5:2018cv00211
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John Preston Bailey
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 2/18/2019. Discovery due by 8/1/2019. Motions due by 8/15/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2019 03:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 11/19/2019 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 2/5/19. (soa)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pentino, Denise)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pentino, Denise)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Shawn Durbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C")(Robinson, Jacob)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Pentino, Denise)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Pentino, Denise)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Pentino, Denise)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 STIPULATION by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Pentino, Denise)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 1/21/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/4/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 2/18/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 12/21/18. (soa)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers WITH FEE PAID from Circuit Court of Brooke Co., WV, (case number 18-C-95). Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #0424-2727483, filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing NOR, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendant details WV SOS, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dubin v. Nationwide Mutual Insurace Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Denise D. Pentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Durbin
Represented By: Jacob M. Robinson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?